VA SB940 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Circuit court clerk's fee; lodging of wills. Increases from $2 to $5 the fee that the circuit court clerk is required to charge for lodging, indexing, and preserving a will.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Circuit court clerk's fee; lodging, etc., of wills.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
2020-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 589 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB940ER)
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (82-Y 16-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House (82-Y 16-N)
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-19HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 4-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateReported from Judiciary (12-Y 1-N)
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-13SenatePresented and ordered printed 20102913D

Same As/Similar To

HB305 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0068)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171275(n/a)See Bill Text
642409(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback