VA SB94 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Energy Plan; Commonwealth Energy Policy. Adopts findings that climate change is an urgent and pressing challenge for Virginia, that swift decarbonization and a transition to clean energy are required to meet the urgency of the challenge, and that the Commonwealth will benefit from being a leader in deploying a low-carbon energy economy. The measure states that the Commonwealth recognizes that the following objectives will advance the health, welfare, and safety of Virginians: (i) establishing sufficient supply and delivery infrastructure to enable widespread deployment of distributed energy resources; (ii) maximizing energy efficiency programs in order to produce electricity cost savings and to create jobs and revenue from the energy efficiency service sector; (iii) establishing greenhouse gas emissions reduction goals across Virginia's economy that reach net-zero emissions by 2045; (iv) requiring that pathways to net-zero greenhouse gas emissions be determined; (v) enabling widespread integration of distributed energy resources into the grid; (vi) mitigating the negative impacts of climate change and the energy transition on disadvantaged communities and prioritizing investment in these communities; (vii) developing the carbon-free energy resources required to fully decarbonize the electric power supply of the Commonwealth including deployment of 30 percent renewables by 2030 and realizing 100 percent carbon-free electric power by 2040; and (viii) ensuring that decision-making is transparent and includes opportunities for full participation by the public. The measure also states that it is the policy of the Commonwealth to (a) ensure the adequate supply of natural gas necessary to ensure the reliability of the electricity supply and the needs of businesses during the transition to renewable energy; (b) establish greenhouse gas emissions reduction standards across all sectors of Virginia's economy that target net-zero emissions carbon by 2045; (c) enact mandatory clean energy standards and overall strategies for reaching net-zero carbon in the electric power sector by 2040; (d) equitably incorporate requirements for technical, policy, and economic analyses and assessments that recognize the unique attributes of different energy resources and delivery systems to identify pathways to net-zero carbon that maximize Virginia's energy reliability and resilience, economic development, and jobs; and (e) minimize the negative impacts of climate change and the energy transition on economically disadvantaged or minority communities and prioritize investment in these areas. The measure also requires that the Virginia Energy Plan identify actions consistent with the goals of achieving a net-zero carbon economy by 2045 and include an inventory of all greenhouse gas emissions for the four years preceding the issuance of the Plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Energy Plan; climate change pressing challenge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 44-N) (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB94ER)
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (52-Y 44-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (52-Y 44-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 16-N)
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: Keam, Lopez, Runion
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-05SenateSenators: Favola, Morrissey, Chafin, Bell
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-05SenateSenate acceded to request (23-Y 17-N)
2020-03-05HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-03-05HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-03-05SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N)
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed House with substitute (53-Y 45-N)
2020-03-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB94H1
2020-03-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20109354D-H1
2020-03-04HouseRead third time
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseReported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-27HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 20109354D-H1
2020-02-27HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2020-01-23SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB94S1
2020-01-23SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20105660D-S1
2020-01-23SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-23SenateRead second time
2020-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105660D-S1
2020-01-20SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
2020-01-10SenateAssigned C&L sub: Energy
2019-12-02SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-12-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100670D

Same As/Similar To

HB714 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB94&201+sum+SB94
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB94+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB94S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB94H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB94ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0021+SB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0119SB0094+SB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0141SB0094+SB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0329+SB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0410+SB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0450+SB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0490+SB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1851+SB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1544SB0094+SB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1642SB0094+SB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1819SB0094+SB0094
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2115+SB0094

Bill Comments

feedback