VA SB921 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Statewide Building Code; security of certain records. Clarifies that while information contained in engineering and construction drawings and plans for any single-family residential dwelling submitted for the purpose of complying with the Uniform Statewide Building Code (?§36-97 et seq.) or the Statewide Fire Prevention Code (?§27-94 et seq.) shall not be subject to disclosure to the public under the Virginia Freedom of Information Act (?§2.2-3700 et seq.), such information shall not be deemed confidential. This bill is identical to HB 683.
Title
Uniform Statewide Building Code; security of certain records.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 92 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB921ER) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB921S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106449D-S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106449D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104762D |