VA SB916 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Towing fees. The bill raises from $25 to $30 the additional fee that can be charged for towing a vehicle at night, on weekends, or on a holiday. The bill requires localities in Planning District 8 and Planning District 16 to set such additional fee at between $25 and $30. Current law requires such localities to set such additional fee at $25.
Title
Towing fees; raises to $30 additional fee that can be charged for towing a vehicle at night, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Reconsider (59-Y 34-N) (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (42-Y 55-N) (Y: 42 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (42-Y 55-N) (Y: 42 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Left in Transportation |
2020-02-25 | House | Rereferred to Transportation |
2020-02-25 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Reconsider (59-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House (59-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (42-Y 55-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Defeated by House (42-Y 55-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (11-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104641D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1233.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |