VA SB901 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Restricted volunteer license for registered and practical nurses and nurse practitioners. Creates a new restricted volunteer license for registered and practical nurses and nurse practitioners who practice in public health or community free clinics that provide services to underserved populations.
Title
Nurses and nurse practitioners, registered and practical; restricted volunteer license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 522 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB901ER) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed House (91-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Constitutional reading dispensed (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102503D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2957.001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3011.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |