VA SB90 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School board of the City of Norfolk; term length. Increases from two years to three years the terms for the members of the school board of the City of Norfolk without affecting the length of any term that began prior to July 1, 2014.
Title
Norfolk, City of; changes length of term for school board members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105) | |
2014-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 105 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB90ER) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-14 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-12 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-16 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101885D |
Same As/Similar To
HB401 (Same As) 2014-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)