VA SB888 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0634)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0634)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Marine Resources Commission; conveyance of easement and rights-of-way; Rappahannock River. Authorizes the Virginia Marine Resources Commission to convey to Virginia Electric and Power Company (Dominion Virginia Power) an easement and rights-of-way needed for constructing and maintaining an underground electric transmission line across the Rappahannock River in Middlesex and Lancaster Counties. The bill provides that none of the right-of-way property that lies within the Baylor Survey shall be considered part of the natural oyster beds, rocks, and shoals of the Commonwealth. This bill is identical to HB 1491.
Title
Marine Resources Commission; conveyance of easement and rights-of-way across Rappahannock River.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0634) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 634 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB888ER) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB888S1 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106456D-S1 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106456D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104137D |