VA SB880 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Genetic counselors; licensing; grandfather clause. Extends the deadline from July 1, 2016, to December 31, 2018, or to within 90 days of the effective date of the relevant regulations promulgated by the Board, whichever is later, by which individuals who have at least 20 years of documented work experience practicing genetic counseling and meet other certain requirements may receive a waiver from the Board of Medicine of the requirements of a master's degree and American Board of Genetic Counseling or American Board of Medical Genetics certification for licensure as a genetic counselor.
Title
Genetic counselors; licensing; grandfather clause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 422 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB880ER) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17101024D-E |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB880E |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101024D |