VA SB871 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0091)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0091)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Amherst. Alters the election of members of the town council of the Town of Amherst from two-year terms to four-year staggered terms. This bill is identical to HB 1240.
Title
Amherst, Town of; amending charter, alters election of members of town council.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0091) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 91 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB871ER) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104117D |