VA SB871 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Board for Asbestos, Lead, and Home Inspectors; examination; initial asbestos worker license applicants. Requires employers to provide each licensed asbestos worker with a written notice containing the following information: (i) a statement that the worker has the right to work in a safe environment, (ii) a summary of basic safety rules for handling asbestos, and (iii) information on how to file a complaint with the Board for Asbestos, Lead, and Home Inspectors. In addition, the bill empowers the Board to summarily suspend the license of an asbestos contractor if the Board finds that the asbestos contractor's conduct poses a substantial danger to the public health or safety and authorizes the Board to suspend, revoke, or deny renewal of an existing license of any asbestos contractor who is shown to have a substantial identity of interest with an asbestos contractor whose license has been revoked.
Title
Asbestos, Lead, and Home Inspectors, VA Board for; notice to asbestos workers, disciplinary action.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Left in General Laws |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB871S1 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104033D-S1 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104033D-S1 |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101016D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 515.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 516.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 516.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |