VA SB870 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0090)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0090)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic filing of land records; fee for paper filing. Provides that a clerk of a circuit court that has established an electronic filing system for land records may charge a fee not to exceed $5 per instrument for every land record filed by paper. This bill is identical to HB 2035.
Title
Electronic filing of land records; fee for paper filing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0090) | |
2017-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 90 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2017 | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/15/17 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB870ER) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2016-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102470D |