VA SB87 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0432)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Special license plates; VB STRONG. Authorizes the issuance of special license plates for supporters of the City of Virginia Beach bearing the legend VB STRONG. The deadline for the receipt of 450 prepaid applications is November 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License plates, special; issuance for supporters of City of Va. Beach bearing the legend VB STRONG.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0432)
2020-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 432 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB87ER)
2020-03-02SenateEnrolled
2020-02-25HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25HouseRead third time
2020-02-24HouseRead second time
2020-02-20HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB87S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107839D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107839D-S1
2019-11-27SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-11-27SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101253D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB87
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB87+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB87S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB87ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0432+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S11V0053+SB0087
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0087+SB0087
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0087+SB0087
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0087+SB0087
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0087+SB0087
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0087+SB0087
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1902V0047+SB0087
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H19V0141+SB0087
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1366+SB0087

Bill Comments

feedback