VA SB87 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hospitalization of inmates in local correctional facilities. Repeals provisions dealing with determining (i) a defendant's competency to be sentenced after he has been convicted of a crime and (ii) whether an inmate who is in the custody of a local correctional facility needs to be involuntarily hospitalized for treatment of mental illness, and substantially incorporates these provisions into statutes dealing generally with determinations of a defendant's competency and the hospitalization of inmates in the custody of local correctional facilities. The bill sets forth the procedures that a court or a person having custody of an inmate must follow to determine whether treatment of mental illness is necessary.
Title
Inmates; court or person having custody to determine if treatment of mental illness is necessary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340) | |
2010-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 340 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-14 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB87ER) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Motion to reconsider constitutional reading dispensed agreed to | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-08 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #3 Mental Health | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB87S1 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104902D-S1 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104902D-S1 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health | |
2010-01-05 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-05 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102686D |
Same As/Similar To
HB311 (Same As) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 169.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 169.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 174.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 175 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 176 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 177.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 178 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 127.1:03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 811 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |