VA SB867 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stroke care quality improvement. Provides that the Department of Health shall be responsible for stroke care quality improvement initiatives in the Commonwealth. Such initiatives shall include (i) establishing systems to collect data and information about stroke care in the Commonwealth, (ii) facilitating information and data sharing and collaboration among hospitals and health care providers to improve the quality of stroke care in the Commonwealth, (iii) requiring the application of evidence-based treatment guidelines for transitioning patients to community-based follow-up care following acute treatment for stroke, and (iv) establishing a process for continuous quality improvement for the delivery of stroke care by the statewide system for stroke response and treatment. The bill also directs the Department of Health to convene a group of stakeholders, which shall include representatives of (a) hospital systems, including at least one hospital system with at least six or more stroke centers in the Commonwealth, recommended by the Virginia Hospital and Healthcare Association; (b) the Virginia Stroke Systems Task Force; and (c) the American Heart Association/American Stroke Association, to advise on the implementation of stroke care quality improvement initiatives. The provisions of the bill making the Department of Health responsible for stroke care quality improvement initiatives in the Commonwealth have a delayed effective date of January 1, 2019. This bill is identical to HB 1197.
Title
Stroke care; Department of Health shall be responsible for quality improvement initiatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 198 (effective - see bill) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB867ER) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB867S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106388D-S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106388D-S1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104425D |