VA SB864 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Continued to 2019 in Finance (15-Y 1-N)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

State Corporation Commission study of cryptocurrencies; report. Directs the State Corporation Commission to conduct a study of the effects of the growth of cryptocurrencies. The Commission shall report its findings to the members of the General Assembly by December 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cryptocurrencies; State Corporation Commission to study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12SenateContinued to 2019 in Finance (15-Y 1-N)
2018-02-12SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-12SenateRereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08SenateRereferred to Commerce and Labor
2018-02-08SenateRereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104903D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback