VA SB861 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
Pending: House Labor and Commerce: Subcommittee #2 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Group health benefit plans; bona fide associations; benefits consortium. Provides that certain trusts constitute a benefits consortium and are authorized to sell health benefits plans to members of a sponsoring association that (i) has been formed and maintained in good faith for purposes other than obtaining or providing health benefits; (ii) does not condition membership in the sponsoring association on any factor relating to the health status of an individual, including an employee of a member of the sponsoring association or a dependent of such an employee; (iii) makes any health benefit plan available to all members regardless of any factor relating to the health status of such members or individuals eligible for coverage through a member; (iv) does not make any health benefit plan available to any person who is not a member of the association; (v) makes available health plans or health benefit plans that meet requirements provided for in the bill; (vi) operates as a nonprofit entity under ?§501(c)(5) or 501(c)(6) of the Internal Revenue Code; and (vii) has been in active existence for at least five years. The bill replaces references to "bona fide association," as used in provisions applicable to health care plans in the small employer market, with the term "sponsoring association."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Group health benefit plans; bona fide associations, benefits consortium.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 2-N) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (35-Y 2-N)
2020-01-23SenatePrinted as engrossed 20103816D-E
2020-01-23SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB861E
2020-01-23SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-01-23SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-01-23SenateRead second time
2020-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-01-15SenateAssigned C&L sub: Health Insurance
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103816D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823420(n/a)See Bill Text
3823431(n/a)See Bill Text
3823432.1(n/a)See Bill Text
3823432.2(n/a)See Bill Text
3823432.3(n/a)See Bill Text
3823521.1(n/a)See Bill Text
382508.5(n/a)See Bill Text
591571(n/a)See Bill Text
591572(n/a)See Bill Text
591573(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback