VA SB86 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Health; sanitary requirements for certain facilities. Directs the Department of Health to amend its regulations to exempt outdoor motorsport facilities that are located on over 1,100 acres of rural property bordering the Dan River and have a track surface of not less than 3.27 miles in length or host a NASCAR national touring race from certain permanent sanitary facility requirements. Department of Health; sanitary requirements for certain facilities. Directs the Department of Health to amend its regulations to exempt outdoor motorsport facilities that are located on over 1,100 acres of rural property bordering the Dan River and have a track surface of not less than 3.27 miles in length or host a NASCAR national touring race from certain permanent sanitary facility requirements.
Title
Outdoor motorsports facilities; regulations regarding sanitary facility requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB86S1 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22104870D-S1 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22104870D-S1 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101365D |