VA SB850 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1058)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Chapters of Acts of Assembly of previous years repealed. Repeals chapters of the Acts of Assembly of 1914, 1916, and 1920 related to the establishment and expansion of the Central State colony for "feeble-minded colored persons" and repeals a chapter of the Acts of Assembly of 1918 related to the appropriation of money for, among other things, the construction of separate sanatoria for white and non-white persons for the treatment of tuberculosis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Central State Colony, etc.; repeals various Chapters relating to establishment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1058)
2020-04-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1058 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-10SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB850ER)
2020-02-27SenateEnrolled
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseReported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateReported from Rules (12-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102520D

Same As/Similar To

HB1521 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1057)

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB850&201+sum+SB850
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB850+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB850ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1058+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S10V0059+SB0850
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0850+SB0850
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0850+SB0850
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0850+SB0850
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0850+SB0850
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0850+SB0850
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H20V0155+SB0850
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1317+SB0850

Bill Comments

feedback