VA SB844 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; short-term plans. Authorizes health insurance carriers in the Commonwealth to offer short-term health plans. Short-term health plans are defined as plans with a duration of 364 days or less. Short-term health plans are required to include a specified disclaimer. The bill is contingent on the adoption of federal regulations expanding the availability of short-term health plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; individual coverage, short-term policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
2018-04-18SenateCommunicated to Governor
2018-04-18SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-09HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-09SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB844ER)
2018-03-09SenateEnrolled
2018-03-07SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed House with amendment (51-Y 46-N)
2018-03-06HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2018-03-06HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-03-06HouseRead third time
2018-03-05HouseRead second time
2018-03-01HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 9-N)
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13SenateSubstitute bill reprinted 18107137D-S3
2018-02-13SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB844S3
2018-02-13SenateSubstitute by Senators Dunnavant and Reeves agreed to 18107137D-S3
2018-02-13SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-13SenateFloor substitute printed 18107137D-S3 (Dunnavant and Reeves)
2018-02-13SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18107049D-S2
2018-02-13SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18106317D-S1
2018-02-13SenateRead second time
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107049D-S2
2018-02-12SenateReported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 3-N)
2018-01-29SenateIncorporates SB671 (Deeds)
2018-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106317D-S1
2018-01-29SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-01-29SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2018-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104732D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823446.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB844
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB844+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB844S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB844S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB844S3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB844ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S02V0060+SB0844
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0242+SB0844
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0494SB0844+SB0844
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0497SB0844+SB0844
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0499SB0844+SB0844
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H14V0206+SB0844
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1347+SB0844
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1036SB0844+SB0844
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1240SB0844+SB0844

Bill Comments

feedback