VA SB839 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Turns in certain residential areas; resident stickers. Allows counties by ordinance to develop a program to issue permits to residents of a designated area that will allow such residents to make turns into or out of the neighborhood during certain times of the day where such turns would otherwise be restricted.
Title
Resident stickers; turns in certain residential areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Pending question ordered (27-Y 13-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18104060D-E |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB839E |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104060D |