VA SB839 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Consumer Protection Act; storm-related repairs. Provides that it is a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act for a supplier to engage in fraudulent or improper or dishonest conduct while engaged in a transaction that was initiated (i) during a declared state of emergency or (ii) to repair damage resulting from the event that prompted the declaration of a state of emergency, regardless of whether the supplier is a licensed contractor. This bill is identical to HB 1422.
Title
Virginia Consumer Protection Act; prohibited practices, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 16 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB839ER) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB839S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104526D-S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104526D-S1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101037D |