VA SB834 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration list maintenance; voters identified as registered in multiple states. Requires the Department of Elections to provide to the general registrars a list of registered voters who have been found through list comparisons and data-matching exchanges with other states to be registered in another state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration list maintenance; voters identified as registered in multiple states.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 49-N) (Y: 48 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
2018-04-18SenateCommunicated to Governor
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 49-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (48-Y 49-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
2018-03-08SenateSigned by President
2018-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-05SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB834ER)
2018-03-05HouseEnrolled
2018-03-01HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 49-N)
2018-03-01HousePassed House (51-Y 49-N)
2018-03-01HouseRead third time
2018-02-28HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-27HouseRead second time
2018-02-23HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N)
2018-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2018-02-08HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-29SenatePassed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
2018-01-29SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
2018-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-23SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 5-N)
2018-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 18105049D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242114(n/a)See Bill Text
242404.4(n/a)See Bill Text
242426.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB834
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB834+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB834ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S08V0043+SB0834
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0131SB0834+SB0834
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0194SB0834+SB0834
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0196SB0834+SB0834
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0197SB0834+SB0834
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1801V0026+SB0834
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H18V0108+SB0834
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1220+SB0834
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1239SB0834+SB0834
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1675+SB0834

Bill Comments

feedback