VA SB832 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0425)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0425)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Taking blood samples pursuant to search warrant; qualified immunity. Provides that no cause of action shall lie in any court against any person authorized by law to withdraw blood pursuant to a search warrant issued in accordance with § 19.2-53 when that person is acting in accordance with such warrant, except in cases of negligence in the withdrawing of blood or willful misconduct.
Title
Blood samples; person authorized to take samples pursuant to a search warrant, immunity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0425) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 425 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB832ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title replaced 15105002D-H1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB832H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105002D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105002D-H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102798D |