VA SB832 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Green Public Buildings Act. Requires executive branch agencies and institutions entering the design phase for construction of a new building greater than 5,000 gross square feet in size, or renovating such a building where the cost of renovation exceeds 50 percent of the value of the building, conform to Virginia Energy Conservation and Environmental Standards developed by the Department of General Services considering the U.S. Green Building Council (LEED) green building rating standard, the Green Building Initiative "Green Globes" building standard, and other appropriate requirements. Exemptions from the requirement may be granted by the Director of the Department of General Services upon a finding of special circumstances that make construction or renovation to the standards impracticable.
Title
Green Public Buildings Act; definitions, building standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB832S1 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104162D-S1 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104162D-S1 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100452D |