VA SB825 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

State Board of Elections; membership; Commissioner of Elections. Increases the membership of the State Board of Elections (Board) from three members to five members, with representation given to each of the political parties having the highest and next highest number of votes in the Commonwealth at the last preceding gubernatorial election. Three Board members are to be of the party of the Governor. Terms of Board members are initially staggered. The Governor shall designate one member of the Board as the Commissioner of Elections, to head the Department of Elections and to act as the principal administrative officer. The Commissioner shall also serve as the chair of the Board. The bill requires the Board to submit an annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections, State Board of; increases membership, Commissioner of Elections to be member of Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (7-Y 33-N) (Y: 7 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N 1-A) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateFailed to pass
2018-03-10SenateNo further action taken
2018-03-10SenateSenators: Cosgrove, Edwards, Chafin
2018-03-10SenateConferees reappointed by Senate
2018-03-08HouseDelegates: Ransone, Cole, Lindsey
2018-03-08HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-07SenateSenators: Edwards, Obenshain, Cosgrove
2018-03-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-07SenateSenate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseHouse requested conference committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2018-03-05SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (7-Y 33-N)
2018-03-01HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N 1-A)
2018-03-01HousePassed House with substitute (51-Y 48-N 1-A)
2018-03-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB825H1
2018-03-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107572D-H1
2018-03-01HouseRead third time
2018-02-28HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-27HouseRead second time
2018-02-23HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107572D-H1
2018-02-23HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
2018-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N)
2018-02-15HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-02-15HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-02-15HouseRead first time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-12SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2018-02-12SenatePassed by temporarily
2018-02-09SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB825S1
2018-02-09SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106652D-S1
2018-02-09SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-09SenateRead second time
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106652D-S1
2018-02-06SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2018-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104230D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22106(n/a)See Bill Text
242102(n/a)See Bill Text
242103(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB825
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB825+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB825S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB825H1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S08V0094+SB0825
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0444SB0825+SB0825
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0368SB0825+SB0825
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1801V0030+SB0825
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H18V0107+SB0825
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1219+SB0825
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0877SB0825+SB0825
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1042SB0825+SB0825

Bill Comments

feedback