VA SB821 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
New River Valley Emergency Communications Regional Authority; annual contributions. Authorizes the Board of the New River Valley Emergency Communications Regional Authority to develop an allocation formula to determine each participating political subdivision's annual contribution to the Authority's annual budget. If the allocation formula is not approved by each participating political subdivision, then each political subdivision shall contribute an amount equal to the Authority's annual budget divided by the number of participating political subdivisions. This bill is identical to HB 1500.
Title
New River Valley Emergency Communications Regional Authority; annual budget contribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 473 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB821ER) |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB821ER) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB821S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106141D-S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106141D-S1 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104348D |