VA SB817 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (11-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (11-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Professions; lawyers; client accounts. Repeals the provision prohibiting the Supreme Court from adopting a disciplinary rule requiring that lawyers deposit client funds in an interest-bearing account.
Title
Lawyers; client accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (11-Y 11-N) (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (11-Y 11-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-01-05 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-05 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102308D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3915.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3916 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |