VA SB813 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Threats of death or bodily injury; penalty. Provides that any person who knowingly communicates, in a writing, a threat to kill or do bodily harm to a person or class of persons, regardless of whether the person or a member of the class of persons who is the object of the threat actually receives the threat, and the threat would place the object of the threat in reasonable apprehension of death or bodily injury is guilty of a Class 6 felony. Current law only governs threats made against a person or his family members or threats to do harm at a school or a school-related event or on a school bus. The bill also expands the types of government activities to include judicial proceedings for which threats to kill or do bodily injury with the intent to influence such government activities are punishable as Class 5 felony.
Title
Threats of death or bodily injury; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Senate: Left in Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104607D-S1 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-01-05 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-05 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101906D |