VA SB805 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Grants for donations to science, technology, engineering, or math (STEM) programs at qualified schools. Establishes a grant program administered by the Board of Education beginning in 2015 for donations made by STEM organizations to qualified schools. The donations must be used by qualified schools to support STEM programs. The bill defines qualified schools as those public elementary and secondary schools at which at least 40 percent of the students qualify for free or reduced lunch. Grants are capped at $50,000 per organization per year. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a 2015 general appropriation act.
Title
STEM programs; grants for donations to qualified schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed bill reprinted 15100714D-E |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15100714D-E |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB805E |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100714D |