VA SB801 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Subpoena duces tecum; attorney-issued subpoena duces tecum; criminal cases. Provides that in any criminal case a subpoena duces tecum may be issued by the attorney of record who is an active member of the Virginia State Bar at the time of issuance, as an officer of the court. The bill provides that any such subpoena duces tecum shall be on a form approved by the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia, signed by the attorney as if a pleading, shall include the attorney's address, and shall be mailed or delivered to the adverse party. The bill also provides that the law governing subpoenas duces tecum issued pursuant to Rule 3A:12(b) shall apply and provides a process for objection to such attorney-issued subpoenas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subpoena duces tecum; attorney of record may issue in any criminal case.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB801ER)
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled
2020-03-05SenateTitle replaced 20109034D-H1
2020-03-05SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N)
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB801H1
2020-03-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20109034D-H1
2020-03-04HouseRead third time
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 20109034D-H1
2020-02-28HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (34-Y 5-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB801S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108087D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
2020-02-10SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108087D-S1
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101345D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19210.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB801&201+sum+SB801
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB801+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB801S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB801H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB801ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0284+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0591SB0801+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0599SB0801+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0609SB0801+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0801V0200+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0404+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1885+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1561SB0801+SB0801

Bill Comments

feedback