VA SB793 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0217)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0217)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Towing vehicles with occupants. Prohibits tow truck drivers and towing and recovery operators from knowingly towing a motor vehicle with occupants.
Title
Towing truck driver, etc.; prohibits occupants in motor vehicle while such vehicle is being towed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 15-N) (Y: 87 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0217) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 217 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB793ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 15-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed House (85-Y 15-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB793S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104258D-S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104258D-S1 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 2-N) |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101674D |