VA SB79 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Optional retirement plan maintained by institution of higher education; withdrawal of contributions before retirement. Allows the governing board of an institution of higher education to establish a policy regarding the number of years of service, or any portion thereof, that an employee must have performed before being entitled to receive all optional retirement plan contributions made on his behalf by the institution if he ceases to be an employee other than by death or retirement. The policy would only apply to employees hired on or after July 1, 2014, who are not in continuous service at the time of hiring.
Title
Higher educational institutions; maintenance of optional retirement plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745) | |
2014-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 745 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB79ER) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-24 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB79S1 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14103870D-S1 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14103870D-S1 |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100513D |