VA SB78 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Trust decanting; authorized fiduciary. Reinstates the restriction in Virginia's former trust decanting law that limits the type of fiduciary who may exercise the decanting power to a disinterested trustee. The bill also reinstates the former provisions that state that the decanting power may be exercised by a majority of the authorized fiduciaries and that the court has the power to appoint a special fiduciary to exercise the decanting power. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Trust decanting; authorized fiduciary.


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
2018-03-08SenateSigned by President
2018-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-05SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB78ER)
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseRead third time
2018-02-27HouseRead second time
2018-02-23HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-30SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24SenateReported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-12-04SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/18 18101870D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
642701(n/a)See Bill Text
642779.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments