VA SB769 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental proceedings; findings of fact. Directs the Department of Environmental Quality (DEQ) to give deference to findings of fact by a presiding officer based on the evidence presented in any formal proceeding where the parties are operating under a consent decree. The bill directs a court to give deference to a factual recommendation by a hearing officer, and creates a rebuttable presumption with respect to such facts. The bill requires that the Director of the Department give the factual and legal basis for the decision to revoke or amend a solid waste management permit.
Title
Environmental proceedings; findings of fact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB769S1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107726D-S1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107726D-S1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104943D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1186.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |