VA SB763 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Special education; recording of classrooms. Requires a local school division, upon written request by a parent or school board employee, to place, operate, and maintain one or more cameras in each self-contained classroom or other special education setting in which a majority of the students in regular attendance are (i) provided special education and related services and (ii) assigned to a self-contained classroom or other special education setting for at least 50 percent of the instructional day.
Title
Special education; recording of classrooms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2017 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-02 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Continued to 2017 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16103864D |