VA SB737 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Early childhood care and education entities; administration of epinephrine. Requires the Board of Education to amend its regulations to require each early childhood care and education entity to implement policies for the possession and administration of epinephrine in every such entity to be administered by any nurse at the entity, employee at the entity, or employee of a local health department who is authorized by a prescriber and trained in the administration of epinephrine to any child believed to be having an anaphylactic reaction. The bill mandates that such policies shall require that at least one school nurse, employee at the entity, or employee of a local health department who is authorized by a prescriber and trained in the administration of epinephrine has the means to access at all times during regular facility hours any such appropriate weight-based dosage of epinephrine that is stored in a locked or otherwise generally inaccessible container or area. This bill shall be known as Elijah's Law.
Title
Early childhood care and education entities; administration of epinephrine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 696 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB737ER) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB737E |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22103738D-E |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22103738D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1328 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695)
HB1328 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695)
HB1328 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 289.059 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |