VA SB722 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-20 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-20 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
In-state tuition; students granted Temporary Protected Status, Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals, and Deferred Action for Parental Accountability. Declares that absent congressional intent to the contrary, any person granted Temporary Protected Status, Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals, or Deferred Action for Parental Accountability by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services does not have the capacity to intend to remain in Virginia indefinitely and, therefore, is ineligible for Virginia domicile and for in-state tuition charges at public institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth.
Title
Tuition, in-state; students granted Temporary Protected Status, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15100381D-E |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB722E |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (8-Y 7-N) |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100381D |