VA SB72 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0354)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric distribution lines; minimum height. Requires that electric distribution lines installed on or after July 1, 2018, upon or over agricultural land shall be placed at a height that is not less than the minimum height requirement that applies to the placement of such lines above road crossings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric distribution lines; minimum height upon or over agricultural land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0354)
2018-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 354 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-05SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
2018-03-02SenateSigned by President
2018-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-27SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB72ER)
2018-02-27SenateEnrolled
2018-02-23HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-23HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-23HouseRead third time
2018-02-22HouseRead second time
2018-02-20HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-02-14HouseRead first time
2018-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-09SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
2017-12-01SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100734D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback