VA SB72 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Unexecuted warrants. Allows an attorney for the Commonwealth to move the court in which the warrant or summons would be returnable for the dismissal of any unexecuted warrant or summons issued by a magistrate. Dismissal would be without prejudice. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unexecuted warrants; allows motion for dismissal by state attorney for warrants unserved.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652)
2010-04-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 652 (effective 7/1/10)
2010-03-15 Senate: Signed by President
2010-03-14 House: Signed by Speaker
2010-03-13 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB72ER)
2010-03-13 Senate: Enrolled
2010-03-09 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2010-03-09 House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2010-03-09 House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N)
2010-03-09 House: Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
2010-03-09 House: Motion to reconsider constitutional reading dispensed agreed to
2010-03-09 House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N)
2010-03-09 House: Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2010-03-09 House: Read second time
2010-03-08 House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
2010-03-01 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
2010-02-16 House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
2010-02-03 House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2010-02-03 House: Read first time
2010-02-03 House: Placed on Calendar
2010-01-21 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2010-01-20 Senate: Printed as engrossed 10101763D-E
2010-01-20 Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB72E
2010-01-20 Senate: Committee amendment agreed to
2010-01-20 Senate: Reading of amendment waived
2010-01-20 Senate: Read second time
2010-01-19 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2010-01-18 Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
2010-01-12 Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
2010-01-05 Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2010-01-05 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101763D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19276.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+SB72
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+SB72+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+SB72E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+SB72ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+CHAP0652+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+S03V0007+SB0072
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+SV0035SB0072+SB0072
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+H0801V0158+SB0072
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+H08V0324+SB0072
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+HV1390+SB0072
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+HV1433+SB0072
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+HV1476+SB0072

Bill Comments

feedback