VA SB715 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - VOTE: DEFEATED (35-Y 62-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - VOTE: DEFEATED (35-Y 62-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Carrying a concealed handgun; firefighters and emergency medical services providers. Provides that any firefighter or person employed as emergency medical services personnel may carry a concealed handgun while engaged in the performance of his official duties, provided that such firefighter or person employed as emergency medical services personnel has been approved to carry a concealed handgun by his fire chief or emergency medical services chief. The bill requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services, in consultation with the Office of Emergency Medical Services of the Department of Health and the Department of Fire Programs, to develop a model policy regarding carrying a concealed handgun for firefighters and emergency medical services personnel.
Title
Firefighters and emergency medical services providers; carrying a concealed handgun.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (35-Y 62-N) (Y: 35 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (35-Y 62-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Defeated by House (35-Y 62-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment by Delegate Cline agreed to |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107583D-H1 |
2018-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107583D-H1 |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 7-N) |
2018-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB715S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18105180D-S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance (11-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105180D-S1 |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103400D |