VA SB71 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1249)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1249)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Firearms on school property. Adds public, private, or religious preschools and licensed child day centers that are not operated at the residence of the provider or of any of the children to the list of schools where possessing a firearm on school property or on a school bus is prohibited. The provisions of the bill regarding child day centers and preschools only apply during the regular operating hours of such child day center or preschool and shall not apply to any person (i) whose residence is on the property of a child day center or a private or religious preschool and (ii) who possesses a firearm or other prohibited weapon while in his residence . Under current law, the list of such schools only includes public, private, or religious elementary, middle, or high schools. The bill also provides that a licensed child day center or religious or private preschool may hire an armed security officer to provide security services.
Title
Firearms; possession on school property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (48-Y 43-N) (Y: 48 N: 43 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Amendments specific and severable (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Amendments specific and severable (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1249) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1249 (effective 7/1/20) |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB71ER2) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (48-Y 43-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (48-Y 43-N) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Amendments specific and severable (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-04-11 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 20110214D-S2 |
2020-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB71ER) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 45-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (53-Y 45-N) |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Hope, Cole, J.G., Batten |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Lucas, Petersen, Stuart |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-03-03 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2020-03-02 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute (54-Y 46-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB71H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108515D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108515D-H1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB71S1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Petersen agreed to 20107958D-S1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20107958D-S1 (Petersen) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101206D |