VA SB708 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Water Quality Improvement Fund; nutrient offsets. Creates the Nutrient Offset Fund as a subfund of the Virginia Water Quality Improvement Fund to be administered by the Director of the Department of Environmental Quality for the purchase of nutrient reductions certified under the Chesapeake Bay Watershed Nutrient Credit Exchange Program. Using moneys from the subfund, the Director of the Department of Environmental Quality may enter into long-term contracts with producers of nutrient offsets to purchase such offsets. Priority shall be given to nutrient offsets produced from facilities that generate electricity from animal waste. The nutrient offsets purchased with moneys from the subfund will be available for sale to owners or operators of new or expanded facilities required to offset nutrient loads through the watershed general permit.
Title
Nutrient Offset Fund; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10104190D-E | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB708E | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10104190D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 2128.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.19:15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.19:18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |