VA SB705 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Issuance of United States passports by clerk's office. Provides that a clerk of a circuit court shall collect whatever fee is specified by the U.S. Department of State for processing and issuing a United States passport, of which $10 shall be paid to the Commonwealth and the remainder shall be deposited with the local treasurer and used solely to fund such services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States passports; issuance by circuit court clerk's office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-29SenateReported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104578D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171275(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback