VA SB704 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0632)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0632)
Summary
Gifts and donations by localities to certain nonprofit foundations. Provides that a locality may make gifts and donations to nonprofit foundations established to support the locality's public parks, libraries, and law enforcement. For the purposes of this bill, "donations" to any such foundation shall include the lawful provision of in-kind resources.
Title
Nonprofit foundations; gifts & donations by localities thereto support public parks, libraries, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0632) | |
2008-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 632 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB704ER) | |
2008-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Passed House (93-Y 4-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Engrossed bill reprinted 084798324-E | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 084798324-E | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB704E | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 084798324 |
Subjects
Charitable, Civic and Volunteer Institutions, and Organizations
Counties, Cities and Towns
Libraries
Public Buildings, Facilities, and Property
Counties, Cities and Towns
Libraries
Public Buildings, Facilities, and Property
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB704 |