VA SB702 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Antique vehicle exhaust systems. Exempts an antique motor vehicle manufactured prior to 1950, provided that the engine is comparable to that designed as standard factory equipment for that particular vehicle and that the exhaust system in good working order, from the requirement that motor vehicle exhaust systems "prevent excessive or unusual noise."
Title
Antique motor vehicles; exhaust systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 77 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB702ER) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15100919D-E |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB702E |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100919D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1551 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0165)