VA SB7 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia State Bar; Clients' Protection Fund; sunset. Extends the sunset provision on the Supreme Court's authority to adopt rules assessing members of the Virginia State Bar an annual fee of up to $25 to be deposited in the Clients' Protection Fund from July 1, 2015, to July 1, 2020.
Title
Clients' Protection Fund; extends sunset provision on Supreme Court's authority to adopt rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 512 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB7ER) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title replaced 14105458D-H1 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 1-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed House with substitute (93-Y 1-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB7H1 |
2014-03-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14105458D-H1 |
2014-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105458D-H1 |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101568D |