VA SB695 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; Internet beer retailers. Creates an Internet beer retailer license, establishes the privileges of and fee for the license, and defines "Internet beer retailer."
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; creates an Internet beer retailer license, definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 337 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB695ER) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House (92-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Taken up out of order pursuant to House Rule 52 (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101735D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |