VA SB69 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter identification; accepted forms of identification. Adds to the list of accepted forms of identification for purposes of voting a valid identification card that contains a photograph of the voter and is issued by any private entity that is licensed or certified, in whole or in part, by the State Department of Health, the Department of Social Services, the Department of Medical Assistance Services, or the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. An employee of any such private entity is currently permitted to use his employee identification card, provided that the card contains a photograph of the voter, for purposes of voting; the bill allows a resident or other person who receives services from such private entity to use a valid identification card issued by the private entity, provided that the card contains a photograph of the voter.
Title
Voter identification; accepted forms of identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-26 | House | Continued to 2017 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2016-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-02-08 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 5-N) |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101430D |