VA SB69 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Surrogacy contracts. Provides that, upon expiration of three days following birth of any resulting child, a surrogate may relinquish her parental rights to the intended parents, if at least one intended parent is the genetic parent of the child, by signing a surrogate consent and report form naming the intended parents as the parents of the child. Under current law, the surrogate may relinquish such parental rights to the intended parents upon expiration of 25 days following birth of any resulting child. The bill also makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor to accept compensation for otherwise arranging or inducing intended parents and surrogates to enter into surrogacy contracts in this Commonwealth. Under current law, to otherwise arrange or induce intended parents and surrogates to enter into surrogacy contracts in this Commonwealth is a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Surrogacy; permits contract to be entered into by an unmarried person, a surrogate, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (87-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage rejected by Senate (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 14-N) (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage rejected by Senate (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 14-N) (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712) | |
2010-04-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 712 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-14 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB69ER) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (87-Y 6-N 1-A) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Passed House (87-Y 6-N 1-A) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Amendments by Delegate Marshall, R.G. withdrawn | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Motion to reconsider constitutional reading dispensed agreed to | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-08 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 1-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage rejected by Senate (18-Y 21-N) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 14-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB69S1 | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Mc Eachin agreed to 10104578D-S1 | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 10104578D-S1 (McEachin) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Committee amendments rejected | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10101317D-E | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB69E | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (8-Y 4-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101317D |