VA SB685 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; GPS tracking device. Provides the authority and the protocol for a law-enforcement officer to apply for a search warrant to permit the use of a GPS tracking device.
Title
GPS tracking device; provides authority & protocol for law enforcement to apply for search warrant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 0-N) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679) | |
2012-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 679 (effective 4/6/12) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB685ER) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Title replaced 12106053D-H2 | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Passed House with substitute (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB685H2 | |
2012-03-08 | House: Substitute by Delegate Albo agreed to 12106053D-H2 | |
2012-03-08 | House: Floor substitute printed 12106053D-H2 (Albo) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Committee substitute rejected 12105949D-H1 | |
2012-03-08 | House: Passed by temporarily | |
2012-03-08 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-07 | House: Read second time | |
2012-03-06 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105949D-H1 | |
2012-03-06 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-03-05 | House: Read first time | |
2012-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12105784D-ES2 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendment SB685ES2 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Reeves agreed to | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB685S2 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Emergency clause added | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Reeves agreed to 12105784D-S2 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 12105784D-S2 (Reeves) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 12105690D-S1 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read first time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105690D-S1 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12105373D | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Introduced at the request of Governor |
Same As/Similar To
HB1298 (Same As) 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0636)